Wiggins v. National Pen Corp. (TV2)
Plaintiff: Tonya Wiggins
Defendant: National Pen Corp. and National Pen Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00069
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by National Pen Tennessee, LLC.(Robinson, Jennifer)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer regarding consolidation as soon as possible and, if the parties are in agreement that the cases should be consolidated for discovery and/or trial, they shall file in each case a joint motion and proposed agreed order regarding consolidation within seven days of the entry of this Order. If the parties are not in agreement, Plaintiff in each caseall of who are represented by the same firmis ORDERED to file a motion to consolidate in each case within ten days of the entry of this Order. Defendant is ORDERED to file a response in each case to any such motions within three days of said filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/3/19. (AWS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Therefore, the parties are ordered to confer regarding consolidation as soon as possible and, if the parties are in agreement that the cases should be consolidated for discovery and/or trial, they shall file in each case a joint motion and proposed agreed order regarding consolidation within seven days of the entry of this Order. If the parties are not in agreement, Plaintiff in each caseall of who are represented by the same firmis ORDERED to file a motion to consolidate in each case within ten days of the entry of this Order. Defendant is ORDERED to file a response in each case to any such motions within three days of said filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/3/2019. (DJH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elise Hofer McKelvey on behalf of National Pen Tennessee, LLC (McKelvey, Elise)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bergstrom Robinson on behalf of National Pen Tennessee, LLC (Robinson, Jennifer)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Pen Tennessee, LLC., filed by Tonya Wiggins.(Collins, Heather)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bergstrom Robinson on behalf of National Pen Tennessee, LLC (Robinson, Jennifer)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to National Pen Tennessee, LLC. (DJH)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A), a plaintiff may amend her complaint once as a matter of right within 21 days after serving the complaint. Plaintiff served Defendant with her complaint on October 31, 2019 [Doc. 6], and then filed an unopposed motion within 21 days to amend her complaint. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint within seven days. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Revise #1 Complaint and Substitute Party by Tonya Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Summons Corrected Summons)(Collins, Heather)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonya Wiggins. National Pen Corp. served on 10/31/2019. (Collins, Heather)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/17/2019. (JCK)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/17/2019. (JCK)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/17/2019. (JCK)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Pen Corp.. (JCK)
October 17, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JCK)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Pen Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4105241.), filed by Tonya Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Collins, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. National Pen Corp. (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Pen Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Pen Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Bergstrom Robinson
Represented By: Elise Hofer McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Wiggins
Represented By: Heather Moore Collins
Represented By: Paige M Lyle
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?