Glasner v. Insurance Company Group Insurance
Plaintiff: Gerald Glasner
Defendant: Licoln National Life Insurance Company Group Insurance
Case Number: 4:2021cv00014
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Licoln National Life Insurance Company Group Insurance. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Licoln National Life Insurance Company Group Insurance.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4722557.) by Licoln National Life Insurance Company Group Insurance. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge J Ronnie Greer no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Katherine A Crytzer for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/16/21. (GRE)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Brent Bradley on 04/06/2021, filed by Gerald Glasner. (Cooper, Joyce)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Licoln National Life Insurance Company Group Insurance. (CNC)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/1/21. (CNC)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/1/21. (CNC)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/1/21. (CNC)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel - Informational Only. (CNC)
April 1, 2021 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CNC)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Gerald Glasner. (Cooper, Joyce)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gerald Glasner ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4699173.), filed by Gerald Glasner. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Defendant)(Cooper, Joyce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasner v. Insurance Company Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Licoln National Life Insurance Company Group Insurance
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Glasner
Represented By: Joyce W Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?