United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right of Way, Etc., More or Less, in Franklin County, Tennessee, and et al
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Robert Peck Fletcher II and An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 4.37 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Franklin County, Tennessee
Case Number: 4:2024cv00067
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. § 945 Compensation for Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of October 17, 2024 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service)(Chase, James)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF POSSESSION. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/24/24. (ABF)
September 23, 2024 Check received on 9/20/2024 from TVA in the amount of $64,100 in response to #8 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. (Receipt No. 100001317) (DCB)
September 20, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
September 20, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
September 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/19/2024. Order served on Court's Financial Deputies. (MKM) Modified per Chambers on 9/23/2024 (DCB).
September 17, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chase, James)
September 17, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(Chase, James)
September 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Filing of Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Chase, James)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/2024. (MKM)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/2024. (MKM)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/2024. (MKM)
September 17, 2024 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (MKM)
September 17, 2024 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (MKM)
September 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Taking, #4 Property Description, #5 Map, #6 Notice of Condemnation, #7 Property Description)(Chase, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right of Way, Etc., More or Less, in Franklin County, Tennessee, and et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Peck Fletcher II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 4.37 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Franklin County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?