Galvan v. Monroe et al
Plaintiff: Jason D. Galvan
Defendant: Douglas Monroe, Shannon Helton, Bruce Bridges, Debra Wagonshutz and Craig D'Apolito
Case Number: 1:2015cv00049
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
County: Maury
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Before the Court is the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Docket Entry No. 86 ) to grant Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 74 ). Plaintiff has not filed an objection. After de novo review, the Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED, and Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 74 ) is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Any appeal of this Order would not be in good faith as required by 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). This is the Final Order in this action. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 1/3/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 74 ) of Defendants Douglas Monroe, Shannon Helton, and Bruce Bridges be GRANTED and this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/6/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 7/16/2015. (xc: Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (ds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvan v. Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Wagonshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D'Apolito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?