Matthews v. Civic Core et al
Plaintiff: Mack Matthews
Defendant: Civic Core, Correction Corporation of America, (f/n/u) Lindamood, Rhonda Staggs and (f/n/u) Riley
Case Number: 1:2016cv00108
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: (1) The Reports and Recommendations (Doc. Nos. 33 & 39 ) are ACCEPTED and APPROVED; (2) Matthews' Motions for Transfer (Doc. Nos. 26 & 27 ) are DENIED; and (3) The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 19 ) filed by Defendants Staggs, Ril ey and Lindamood is hereby GRANTED and the claims against those Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge Holmes for further pretrial case management in relation to Matthews' Eighth Amendment claims against Defendant CivicCore. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/26/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned Magistrate Judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that the motion to dismiss (Docket Entry No. 19 ) filed by Defendants Rhonda Staggs, Rhonda Riley, and Cherry Lindamood be GRANTED and that these Defendants be DISMI SSED from the lawsuit. ANY OBJECTIONS to this Report and Recommendation must be filed with the Clerk of Court within fourteen (14) days of service of this Report and Recommendation and must state with particularity the specific portions of this Repo rt and Recommendation to which objection is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/8/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, to which no timely objections have been filed. (Doc. No. 15.) The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and conducted a de novo review of the reco rd. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 6) is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/13/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail)(af) Modified on 3/13/2017 (af).
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Docket Entry No. 6) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/15/2017. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Civic Core et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civic Core
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Lindamood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?