Starlink Logistics, Inc. v. ACC, LCC et al
Plaintiff: Starlink Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: ACC, LCC and T & K Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00029
Filed: April 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
County: Maury
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Presiding Judge: Waverly D. Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to strike and exclude the May 23 report of Mr. Jones ( 63 ) is granted except to the limited extent that (i) Mr. Jones may testify in full as to his initial report, including to the extent that Mr. Jones' initial r eport overlaps with the May 23 report and (ii) Defendant may cross examine Plaintiff's expert, Jim Evans, about deficiencies or other issues identified in the May 23 report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant T&K Construction, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/3/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starlink Logistics, Inc. v. ACC, LCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starlink Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Habel
Represented By: Lynda M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACC, LCC
Represented By: William Joseph Haynes, III
Represented By: Sharon Orenstein Jacobs
Represented By: Kori Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T & K Construction, LLC
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?