United States of America v. Oden

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Consuela Oden
Case Number: 1:2018cv00073
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Letter regarding request for records from IRS Special Agent Poshedley from Consuela Oden. (am)
October 12, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #4 : The document is scanned and not text searchable. Scanning should only be used for documents not created on your computer. This document does not need to be re-filed unless otherwise directed by the Court. (am)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, #3 Order to Show Cause, (Bishop, Kyle)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/3/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/2/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 28, 2018 DC State Bar status verified as active for Kyle L. Bishop. (am)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Special Agent Suzanne Poshedley filed by United States of America re: #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (am) Modified Text on 9/28/2018 (am).
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons to Consuela Oden, #3 Exhibit B - Letter to Consuela Oden, #4 Attachment - Proposed Order to Show Cause,(am) Modified Text on 9/27/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Oden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Consuela Oden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?