Spencer v. Wettermark & Keith, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Spencer
Defendant: John McElheny, Wattermark & Keith, LLC and Wettermark & Keith, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen A. Spencer. John McElheny served on 7/13/2019. (Day, David)
July 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer John McElheny answer due 8/19/2019; Wettermark & Keith, LLC answer due 8/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/23/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 7/24/2019 (am).
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John McElheny, Wettermark & Keith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed order)(Reviere, Russell) Modified Text on 7/23/2019 (am).
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen A. Spencer. Wettermark & Keith, LLC served on 7/1/2019. (Day, David) Modified Text on 7/15/2019 (am).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 24, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr as he handles all the Columbia cases. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. (af)
June 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Graves, Jr, David Owen Day. (am)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to John McElheny, Wettermark & Keith, LLC. (Service packets sent to attorney David Day by regular mail.) (am) Modified Text on 7/15/2019 (am).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 03:00 PM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephen A. Spencer against John McElheny, Wettermark & Keith, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2937485). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Release, #2 Exhibit 2-Drafted Complaint, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af) Modified on 7/15/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Wettermark & Keith, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McElheny
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wattermark & Keith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wettermark & Keith, LLC
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Spencer
Represented By: David Owen Day
Represented By: Edward M. Graves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?