Alderson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Camethia Joyce Alderson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2019cv00058
Filed: July 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT #34675055869 in the amount of $100 re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jw)
July 18, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert C. Wilson. (jw)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/17/2019. (jw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Wilson on behalf of Camethia Joyce Alderson (Wilson, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for attorney David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Camethia Joyce Alderson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificates of Good Standing)(Chermol, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 8/6/2019. (jw)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/6/2019. (jw)
July 16, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for David F. Chermol. (jw)
July 13, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Camethia Joyce Alderson. (jw)
July 13, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Camethia Joyce Alderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alderson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camethia Joyce Alderson
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Represented By: Robert C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?