Grooms v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Tyson S. Grooms
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2019cv00060
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Meredith E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/1/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIPT #34675055736 in the amount of $100.00 re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jm)
July 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Dacey R. Cockrill. (jm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (xc: Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dacey R. Cockrill on behalf of Tyson S. Grooms (Cockrill, Dacey)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/18/2019. (jm)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Meredith Marcus: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 8/7/2019. (jm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Meredith Emily Marcus from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois filed by Tyson S. Grooms. (jm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Meredith E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid) by Tyson S. Grooms. (jm) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (jm).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Tyson S. Grooms. (jm)
July 16, 2019 IL State Bar status verified as active for Meredith Marcus. (jm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Tyson S. Grooms. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm) Modified on 7/16/2019 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grooms v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson S. Grooms
Represented By: Meredith Marcus
Represented By: Dacey R. Cockrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?