Knowles v. Finley et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Paul Knowles
Defendant: Stella L. Hargrove, Michael D. Cox, Robyn Dell (Finley) Knowles, Robyn Dell Finley and Robyn Dell Knowles
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/26/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss this case. #20 Plaintiff shall have until October 9, 2019, to file a response to the motion. Plaintiff is advised that his failure to timely file a response that addresses the arguments for dismissal made by Defendant may result in a Recommendation to the District Judge that this lawsuit be dismissed in whole or in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/24/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb)
September 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Seth M. Lasater. (gb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael D. Cox, Robyn Dell Finley. (Lasater, Seth)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael D. Cox, Robyn Dell Finley. (Lasater, Seth)
September 18, 2019 FILER TO USE OWN ECF ACCOUNT: The filings made at DE #18 and #19 are DISREGARDED. They were filed in the Court's CM/ECF system by attorney Michael Cox but signed by Seth Lasater. Counsel who signed the pleadings shall refile the documents using his or her own CM/ECF filing credentials. (gb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 ***DISREGARDED - FILING ACCOUNT AND SIGNATURE DO NOT MATCH*** MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael D. Cox, Robyn Dell Finley . (Cox, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (gb).
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 ***DISREGARDED - FILING ACCOUNT AND SIGNATURE DO NOT MATCH*** First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael D. Cox, Robyn Dell Finley. (Cox, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (gb).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and concludes it should be adopted and approved. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Hearing ( #9 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/17/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #14 Order to Show Cause. (gb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #14 Order to Show Cause. (gb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By no later than September 13, 2019, Plaintiff must file a response to this Order showing cause why his lawsuit should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/29/19. (xc:Pro se party by certified and regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Hearing ( #9 ) be DENIED. ANY OBJECTIONS to this Report and Recommendation must be filed with the Clerk of Court within 14 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/29/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration of all pretrial matters. Any dispositive motions file shall be considered by the Magistrate Judge, who shall submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for disposition. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/26/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Summons issued as to Michael D. Cox and Robyn Dell Finley. (gb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ronald Paul Knowles. (gb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing by Ronald Paul Knowles. (gb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Michael D. Cox, Robyn Dell Finley, filed by Ronald Paul Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Marriage Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chancery Court Order)(gb)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Based on the filings by Plaintiff, the Court concludes Plaintiff has not demonstrated a strong or substantial likelihood of success at this stage of the proceedings because the material facts relating to Plaintiff's claims have not been established. Therefore, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ( #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Review re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ronald Paul Knowles. (gb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ronald Paul Knowles. (gb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ronald Paul Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Document and Picture)(gb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Ronald Paul Knowles. (gb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael D. Cox, Stella L. Hargrove, Robyn Dell (Finley) Knowles (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 34675056033), filed by Ronald Paul Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Receipt)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella L. Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Cox
Represented By: Seth M. Lasater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Dell (Finley) Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Dell Finley
Represented By: Seth M. Lasater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Dell Knowles
Represented By: Seth M. Lasater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Paul Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?