Paradise v. Armada Nutrition LLC
Plaintiff: Clover Paradise
Defendant: Armada Nutrition LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00075
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/19/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) by Armada Nutrition LLC.(Rosenblatt, Rachel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 2:00 PM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
September 13, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel R. Rosenblatt, Elise Hofer McKelvey and Nina H. Parsley. (dt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Armada Nutrition LLC. (dt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Armada Nutrition LLC from Circuit Court of Maury County, Tennessee, case number 16577. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2991328) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Maury County Circuit Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Maury County Circuit Court Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Removal in Maury County Circuit Court, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradise v. Armada Nutrition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clover Paradise
Represented By: Nina H. Parsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armada Nutrition LLC
Represented By: Rachel R. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Elise Hofer McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?