Flatt v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Violet Jane Flatt
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2019cv00089
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/17/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 16, 2019 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (gb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Violet Jane Flatt. Social Security Administration served on 11/21/2019. (Reasonover, Julie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/12/19. (gb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3028125), filed by Violet Jane Flatt. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)
November 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Julie A. Reasonover. (gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flatt v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Jane Flatt
Represented By: Julie A. Reasonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?