Bratton v. Maury County Government
Plaintiff: Randy Bratton
Defendant: Maury County Government
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maury County Government.(Williams, Robyn)
January 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robyn Beale Williams. (mg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Beale Williams on behalf of Maury County Government (Williams, Robyn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Randy Bratton. (Hunter, Anne)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paige M. Lyle terminated. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/20/2019. (mg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Randy Bratton. Maury County Government served on 12/19/2019. (Hunter, Anne)
December 19, 2019 **DISREGARD**NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 19 : The incorrect PDF was filed. This document is disregarded. Counsel shall re-file the document. (am) Modified on 12/19/2019 (am).
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paige M. Lyle by Randy Bratton. (Lyle, Paige)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Maury County Government. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) Modified on 12/9/2019 (mg).
December 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter, and Paige M. Lyle. (mg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maury County Government (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3045340), filed by Randy Bratton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton v. Maury County Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Bratton
Represented By: Paige M. Lyle
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury County Government
Represented By: Robyn Beale Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?