Haynes v. Buffalo Valley, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Haynes
Defendant: Buffalo Valley, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendant has moved to stay or in the alternative to continue the initial case management conference to allow for an EEOC mediation of Plaintiff's ADA claims. (Docket No. #13 .) Plaintiff filed a response in opposition to the motion. (Docket No. #14 .) The Court has reviewed the entire record in this case, and finds that Defendant's motion (Docket No. #13 ) is not well taken and is therefore DENIED. Although the initial case management conference remains scheduled for February 7, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., it is moved from Columbia and will, instead be held in Nashville in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway. The parties must file a joint proposed initial case management order by no later than the close of business on February 6, 2020. See Notice at Docket No. #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Sharon Haynes. (Teeples, N.)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay or in theAlternative, Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Sharon Haynes. (Teeples, N.)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay or in theAlternative, Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Buffalo Valley, Inc.. (Blackburn, Christen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Buffalo Valley, Inc..(Blackburn, Christen)
January 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christen C. Blackburn. (mg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christen C. Blackburn on behalf of Buffalo Valley, Inc. (Blackburn, Christen)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Sharon Haynes. Buffalo Valley, Inc. served on 12/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Green Card Returned)(Yezbak, Charles)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buffalo Valley, Inc., filed by Sharon Haynes.(Teeples, N.)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed 12-22-2019 Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Green Card Returned)(Yezbak, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles P. Yezbak, III (Yezbak, Charles)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/13/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 02:30 PM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Buffalo Valley, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buffalo Valley, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3049311), filed by Sharon Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
December 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles P. Yezbak, III, and N. Chase Teeples. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Buffalo Valley, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Christen C. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Haynes
Represented By: N. Chase Teeples
Represented By: Charles P. Yezbak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?