Kelley v. Lawrenceburg County Jail
Plaintiff: Gary McArthur Kelley
Defendant: Lawrence County Jail
Case Number: 1:2020cv00007
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Gary McArthur Kelley, an inmate of the Lawrence County Jail in Lawrenceburg, Tennessee, brings this pro se action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 against the Lawrence County Jail. (Doc. No. #1 ). In order to file a civil lawsuit, a plaintiff must submit the civil filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis. In addition, if seeking pauper status, a plaintiff must provide a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the 6-month period. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners. Further, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a blank form complaint for prisoner civil rights actions. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/7/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a blank IFP application and a blank form complaint for prisoner civil rights actions.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 6, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice, Consent form included.) (mg)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-01032. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 2/6/2020 (mg).
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 2/6/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Lawrenceburg County Jail, filed by Gary McArthur Kelley. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 judge's card)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020: #3 Magistrate Judicial Card) (jae). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 2/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Lawrenceburg County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary McArthur Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?