Demonbreun et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terri Demonbreun and Homer Demonbreun
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00042
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF STAY: Before the Court is the joint motion of Plaintiffs Terri Demonbreun and Homer Demonbreun and Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (collectively, the Parties) to stay this litigation while the Parties finalize a settlement reached in principle by the Parties. Finding that a stay will facilitate further settlement negotiations and promote judicial economy, and finding that the Parties agree to the requested relief, the Court finds the joint motion well-taken. It is, therefore, ORDERED that all deadlines in this matter are STAYED until February 1, 2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2020. (am)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2020. (am)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order)(Drinkwater, William)
August 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(c), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steve Schulte is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 08/23/2020.(vk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Steve Schulte filed by Homer Demonbreun, Terri Demonbreun re: Annotation - Deficiency Notice, #13 MOTION for attorney Steve Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3190583). (Leniski, Joey)
August 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steve Schulte. (am)
August 13, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#13 : By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (am)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Ramsey, Shane)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Steve Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3190583) by Homer Demonbreun, Terri Demonbreun. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - USDC NDTX)(Leniski, Joey)
July 31, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey, William W. Drinkwater. (am)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Ramsey, Shane)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Ramsey, Shane)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drinkwater on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Drinkwater, William)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ramsey, Shane)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/14/2020 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon the transfer of this case to Judge Trauger (Docket No. 6), the reference to the magistrate judge is hereby WITHDRAWN. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/22/2020. (am) Modified Text on 7/23/2020 (am). Modified Text on 7/27/2020 (am).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr no longer assigned to case. This case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Aleta A. Trauger as an earlier-filed related case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/22/2020. (am)
July 21, 2020 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) Joey P. Leniski, Jr, (TX) Steve Schulte. (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3178807), filed by Terri Demonbreun, Homer Demonbreun. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demonbreun et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Demonbreun
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer Demonbreun
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?