Hood v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Xavier Maurice Hood
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2020cv00048
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed as to Social Security Administration served on 9/14/2020. (dt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed as to U.S. Attorney General served on 9/17/2020. (dt) Modified on 10/5/2020 (dt).
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney/MDTN on 9/15/2020. (dt)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to USM for service. (dt)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by Xavier Maurice Hood. (Coleman, Erin) Modified on 8/27/2020 (kc).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Erin D. Coleman. (dt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Xavier Maurice Hood. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Maurice Hood
Represented By: Erin D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?