Beach v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: La'Prince Beach
Defendant: Tony Parker and Dr. Cortez Tucker
Case Number: 1:2020cv00051
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Cortez Tucker. (forwarded to USM for service.) (vh)
October 9, 2020 Pro se party called to update address. Address updated per phone call. (am)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ASSESSING FILING FEE($350) FOR La'Prince Beach. The Court GRANTS #4 IFP in this matter. Plaintiff nonetheless remains responsible for paying the full filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Maury County Jail. The claims against Commissioner Parker and the official-capacity claim against Dr. Tucker are DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to file an amended complaint if he can allege facts that satisfy the standards explained above. The Clerk is INSTRUCTED to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for Defendant Tucker in his individual capacity. Plaintiff MUST complete the service packet and return it to the Clerk's office within 21 days of the date of this Order. Upon return of the completed service packet, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. on 9/30/2020.(xc:Pro se party by regular mail with 1 service packet.) (copy sent to Administrator of Maury County Jail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 9/30/2020 (kc). Modified text on 10/23/2020 (hb). Modified on 10/23/2020 (kc).
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by La'Prince Beach. (vh)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: La'Prince Beach, a state prisoner housed in the Turney Center Industrial Complex in Only, Tennessee, filed a pro se civil rights Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983. (Doc. No. #1 .) This Complaint, however, was not accompanied by either the requisite filing fee or by an application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees and costs. The Court may not consider the merits of a civil complaint unless it is accompanied by the appropriate fee, 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), or by an application to proceed in forma pauperis sufficient to satisfy 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (short form) and a copy of Administrative Order 93. To proceed with his lawsuit, Plaintiff MUST either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full or complete the application to proceed in forma pauperis and return the properly completed application to the Court. Plaintiff's full payment or supported application must be received in this Court within 30 days of the date this Order is entered on the docket and must include the docket number assigned to this case: No. 1:20-00051. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/9/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/blank IFP short form and Admin Order 93. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
September 4, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Parker and Cortez Tucker, filed by La'Prince Beach.(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beach v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Prince Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cortez Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?