Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Lawrenceburg Utility Systems
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: Lawrenceburg Utility Systems and City of Lawrenceburg, Tennessee, The Acting by and Through the Lawrenceburg Board of Utilites Commission doing business as Lawrenceburg Utility Systems
Case Number: 1:2020cv00052
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 Summons issued as to City of Lawrenceburg, Tennessee, The. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lawrenceburg Utility Systems, filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Nichols Declaration, #3 Attachment Summons)(Martin, Mark)
October 22, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to continue the October 26, 2020, initial case management conference filed October 22, 2020, Docket Entry No. 10. Counsel reports that service has not yet been effected on Defendant. The Court will GRANT the continuance, and the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from October 26, 2020, to 1:30 p.m, Wednesday, January 20, 2021, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Martin, Mark)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on August 19, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on October 26, 2020, will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Martin is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 09/13/2020. (vk)
September 10, 2020 State Bar status verified as active for (Admitted in TN State Bar & TNMD) Elizabeth A. Alexander, (Admitted in TN State Bar & TNMD) Jason D. Holleman, (Admitted in AL) Mark E. Martin. (am)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Mark E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3212606) by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Martin, Mark)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Lawrenceburg Utility Systems. (Summons sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (am)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrenceburg Utility Systems (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3211912), filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - June Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Nichols Declaration)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Lawrenceburg Utility Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrenceburg Utility Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lawrenceburg, Tennessee, The Acting by and Through the Lawrenceburg Board of Utilites Commission doing business as Lawrenceburg Utility Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Mark E. Martin
Represented By: Jason D. Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?