Barber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Barber
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2020cv00064
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
3 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bert Coleman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/01/2020. (vk)
November 24, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman not admitted to this court - Local counsel not required. (dt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/22/2020. (dt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Coleman, Bert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 11/24/2020 (dt).
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General/USA on 10/30/2020. (dt)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney on 10/20/2020. (dt)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to USM for service. (dt)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/13/2020. (dt)
October 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Grayson Smith Cannon admitted to this court. (kc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tina Marie Barber. (kc) Modified on 10/13/2020 (kc).
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) Modified on 10/13/2020 (kc).
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tina Marie Barber. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) Modified on 10/13/2020 (kc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Barber
Represented By: Grayson Smith Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?