Cowart v. City of Pulaski, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Dale Cowart
Defendant: City of Pulaski, Tennessee, Kerry T. Gilbert, John and Jane Doe #1-5 and Jeffery C. Holley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00072
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Anthony Dale Cowart. (Leventis, Henry)
January 7, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for William C. Mazzota admitted to this court. (am)
January 6, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Pulaski, Tennessee.(Ricks, Teresa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Mazzota on behalf of City of Pulaski, Tennessee (Mazzota, William)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kerry T. Gilbert.(Burns, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeffery C. Holley.(Burns, Robert)
January 5, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert M. Burns admitted to this court. (am)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Kerry T. Gilbert, Jeffery C. Holley (Burns, Robert)
December 28, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Teresa Reall Ricks admitted to this court. (am)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. City of Pulaski, Tennessee answer due 1/6/2021; Kerry T. Gilbert answer due 1/6/2021; Jeffery C. Holley answer due 1/6/2021. All parties shall participate in the preparation of the joint proposed initial case management order in advance of the 1/19/21 ICMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/23/2020. (vh)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Pulaski, Tennessee. (Ricks, Teresa)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Reall Ricks on behalf of City of Pulaski, Tennessee (Ricks, Teresa)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Dale Cowart. City of Pulaski, Tennessee served on 12/3/2020. (Jackson, Samuel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Dale Cowart. Kerry T. Gilbert served on 12/3/2020. (Jackson, Samuel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Dale Cowart. Jeffery C. Holley served on 12/2/2020. (Jackson, Samuel)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on November 30, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 11:30 a.m. on January 19, 2021, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753 Access Code: 3808663# Counsel are reminded of the requirement to file a joint proposed initial case management order at least three (3) business days prior to the initial case management conference (with a copy emailed to Ms. Jeanne Cox, Courtroom Deputy [Jeanne_W_Cox@tnmd.uscourts.gov]). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/3/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 12/8/2020 (am).
November 19, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Henry C. Leventis admitted to this court. (am)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
November 17, 2020 TN & TNMD State Bar status verified as active for Samuel L. Jackson, John Christopher Williams admitted to this court. (am)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to City of Pulaski, Tennessee, Kerry T. Gilbert, Jeffery C. Holley. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Pulaski, Tennessee, Kerry T. Gilbert, Jeffery C. Holley, John and Jane Doe #1-5 (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3257557), filed by Anthony Dale Cowart. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowart v. City of Pulaski, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pulaski, Tennessee
Represented By: Teresa Reall Ricks
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry T. Gilbert
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery C. Holley
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dale Cowart
Represented By: Samuel L. Jackson
Represented By: John Christopher Williams
Represented By: Henry C. Leventis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?