Walls v. Pulaski Electric System
Plaintiff: Jonathon C. Walls
Defendant: Pulaski Electric System
Case Number: 1:2021cv00025
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 VA State Bar status verified as active for Joshua C. Cumby admitted to this court. (vh)
May 27, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Margaret R.T. Myers admitted to this court. (vh)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pulaski Electric System. (Myers, Margaret)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pulaski Electric System.(Myers, Margaret)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Cumby on behalf of Pulaski Electric System (Cumby, Joshua)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret R.T. Myers on behalf of Pulaski Electric System (Myers, Margaret)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Jonathon C. Walls. Pulaski Electric System served on 5/4/2021. (Janney, Douglas)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/6/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Pulaski Electric System. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
April 20, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas B. Janney, III admitted to this court. (vh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pulaski Electric System (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3354371), filed by Jonathon C. Walls. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Pulaski Electric System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon C. Walls
Represented By: Douglas B. Janney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski Electric System
Represented By: Joshua C. Cumby
Represented By: Margaret R.T. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?