Shelton v. Prevail Water, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Shelton
Defendant: Prevail Water, Inc., Percy Jones, Jr., Jimmy M. Parker, John Doe and Mary Roe 1 to 10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00048
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/24/2021. (xc: Defendants Percy Jones and Jimmy Parker by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: To allow an opportunity for Defendants to retain counsel, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for October 20, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. (CT) to be held telephonically using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753 with access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/24/2021. (xc: Defendants Percy Jones and Jimmy Parker sent this order and the amended complaint (Docket No. 11) by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 23, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/23/2021; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :55)(jwc)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER of Plaintiff filed by Timothy D. Shelton. (Long, Casey)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Percy Jones, Jr. (jm)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 Summary of Lawsuit by Jimmy M. Parker. (jm)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Timothy D. Shelton. Jimmy M. Parker served on 7/21/2021; Prevail Water, Inc. served on 7/21/2021. (jm)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On August 3, 2021, Plaintiff filed an amended complaint. (Docket No. #11 .) The amended complaint does not contain a certificate of service. Nor does the Notice of Abstract of Lien Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff on July 21, 2021 (Docket No. #10 ) include a certificate of service. Plaintiff and his counsel are cautioned that continued failure to include the required certificate of service on filed documents, including electronically filed documents, will result in the Court striking the noncompliant documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/4/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court has received, by email to Courtroom Deputy Jeanne W. Cox, three emails from Defendant Jimmy M. Parker. At least two emails contain attachments that appear to be Mr. Parker's answer to the complaint. The Court has requested that the Clerk of Court respond to Mr. Parker to advise him that emailing the Courtroom Deputy is an improper way to submit and file any documents with the Court. The answer will not be filed on the Court's docket until Mr. Parker properly files it through one of the methods accepted by the Clerk of Court. Finally, Mr. Parker is advised that an Amended Complaint was filed on August 3, 2021. If Mr. Parker has not yet been served with a copy of the Amended Complaint, he shall contact Plaintiff's counsel to obtain a copy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/4/2021. (xc: pro se party by regular mail to the address noted in Docket Entry No. #7 .) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy D. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed, #2 Exhibit Parker/Shelton Agreement, #3 Exhibit Parker/Prevail Agreement, #4 Exhibit Judgment)(Long, Casey)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Abstract of Lien Lis Pendens by Timothy D. Shelton. (jm)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Timothy D. Shelton (Long, Casey)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Percy Jones, Jr, Jimmy M. Parker, and Prevail Water, Inc. (Service copies to be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Adam Long on behalf of Timothy D. Shelton. (jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Percy Jones, Jr, Jimmy M. Parker, and Prevail Water, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3410384), filed by Timothy D. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Supporting Documentation, #3 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Documentation, #4 Exhibit 3 - Supporting Documentation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Supporting Documentation)(jm)
July 15, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Casey Adam Long admitted to this court. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Prevail Water, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Shelton
Represented By: Casey Adam Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevail Water, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?