Pillow v. Frink
Petitioner: Brian Pillow
Respondent: Warden Martin Frink
Case Number: 1:2021cv00066
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is GRANTED. Respondent is ORDERED to respond to Petitioner's equitable tolling argument within 30 days of entry of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on Respondent and the Attorney General of Tennessee. See Habeas Rule 4. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/3/2021. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail. Copy of Order and Petition forwarded to Respondent and TN Attorney General's office ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brian Pillow. (ln)
October 28, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas S. Bolduc admitted to this court. (ln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Bolduc on behalf of Martin Frink (Bolduc, Nicholas)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This Court cannot consider the petition until Petitioner has either submitted the filing fee or has been granted leave to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a blank short-form Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Within 30 days from the date of entry of this Order on the docket, Petitioner MUST submit to the Court either the $5.00 filing fee or the completed application. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/27/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a blank short-form Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 26, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brian Pillow. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pillow v. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Martin Frink
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bolduc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?