Tucker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Micah Ernest Tucker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2022cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney General on 1/25/2022 (kc)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VII on 1/24/2022. (kc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney's Office on 1/25/2022. (kc)
January 16, 2022 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE ENTRY.***TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis admitted to this court. (kc) Modified on 1/16/2022 (kc).
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packet put in USM's box at intake.) (kc)
January 6, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis admitted to this court. (ln)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Cost (Docket No. #2 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/5/2022. (hb)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Kaludis on behalf of Micah Ernest Tucker (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Kaludis, William)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 01/05/2022. (lh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
January 5, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 1/26/2022. (kc)
January 5, 2022 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3507802) by Micah Ernest Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(kc) Modified on 1/5/2022 (kc).
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Micah Ernest Tucker. (kc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee not paid), filed by Micah Ernest Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeal Council Action, #2 Attachment - Letter to Clerk, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Ernest Tucker
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?