Pugh v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cynthia J. Pugh
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2022cv00016
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia J. Pugh. Social Security Administration served on 7/6/2022. (Cannon, Grayson)
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia J. Pugh; U.S. Attorney served on 07/12/2022 (signed by Melissa Russell). (Cannon, Grayson) Modified on 7/18/2022 (ln).
July 15, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia J. Pugh; Attorney General served on 07/11/2022. (Cannon, Grayson) Modified on 7/18/2022 (ln).
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b), and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/27/2022. (ln)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 RECEIPT #34675066154 in the amount of $402.00 posted by Cynthia J. Pugh re #1 Social Security Complaint. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Cost (Docket No. #3 ) is DENIED. To continue this action, Plaintiff MUST submit the full $402.00 filing to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date this Order is entered on the docket. Failure to comply or request an extension by the deadline will result in dismissal. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/24/2022. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 24, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Grayson Smith Cannon admitted to this court. (ln)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cynthia J. Pugh. (ln)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Grayson Smith Cannon on behalf of Cynthia J. Pugh. (ln)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee not paid) filed by Cynthia J. Pugh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pugh v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia J. Pugh
Represented By: Grayson Smith Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?