Griffin v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Griffin
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00004
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2023. Discovery due by 5/1/2024. Motions due by 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 03/16/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
March 15, 2023 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2023. (Hearing lasted :47)(ww)
March 9, 2023 Filing 23 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER proposed by FCA US and Griffin filed by Johnny Griffin. (Queener, Henry)
March 1, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Add and Terminate Parties, by Johnny Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Queener, Henry)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant Robert Bosch LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. No. #9 ), to which Plaintiff has not responded. The motion is GRANTED as unopposed. See L.R. 7.01(a)(3). Accordingly, Defendant Robert Bosch LLC is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/1/2023. (mg)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 , #17 , and #18 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Joseph E. Ritch, Philip Reed McDaniel, and Jason Paul Hartman to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill on 03/01/2023. (lh)
February 24, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paige I. Bernick admitted to this court. (ad)
February 23, 2023 TX State Bar status verified as active for Philip R. McDaniel not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
February 23, 2023 TX State Bar status verified as active for Jason P. Hartman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
February 22, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige I. Bernick on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Bernick, Paige)
February 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Jason Paul Hartman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3766218) by Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jason P. Hartman, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Chapski, Robert)
February 20, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Philip Reed McDaniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number BTNMDC-3766209) by Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Philip R. McDaniel, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Chapski, Robert)
February 16, 2023 TX State Bar status verified as active for Joseph E. Ritch not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
February 15, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Joseph E. Ritch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3764354) by Johnny Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Louisiana Certificate of Good Standing)(Queener, Henry)
February 14, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert F. Chapski admitted to this court. (ad)
February 14, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon J. Brady admitted to this court. (ad)
February 13, 2023 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC. (Brady, Gordon)
February 13, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC.(Brady, Gordon)
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by Robert Bosch LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Description of Exhibits (Chapski, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(h)(2), notice is hereby given to the District Judge and the parties of the filing of a dispositive motion. See #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/10/2023. (ww)
February 10, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ad)
February 9, 2023 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Robert Bosch LLC. (Chapski, Robert)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Bosch LLC . (Chapski, Robert)
February 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Chapski, Robert)
January 30, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Johnny Griffin. FCA US LLC served on 1/23/2023. (Queener, Henry)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Johnny Griffin. Robert Bosch LLC served on 1/20/2023. (Queener, Henry)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 01/20/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
January 19, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to FCA US LLC, Robert Bosch LLC. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (ad)
January 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/13/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
January 19, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Henry S. Queener, III admitted to this court. (ad)
January 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, Robert Bosch LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3744714), filed by Johnny Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Griffin
Represented By: Henry S. Queener, III
Represented By: Joseph E. Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Gordon J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Jason P. Hartman
Represented By: Paige I. Bernick
Represented By: Philip R. McDaniel
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?