Terry Richardson Concrete LLC v. Mack Mechanichal, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Terry Richardson Concrete LLC
Defendant: Mack Mechanical, Inc and American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00109
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Cookeville Office
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 159 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff shall be awarded $70,564.60 in attorneys fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/12/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/30/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: The time for the parties to file a joint notice advising the court regarding resolution of all pending issues is extended to September 3, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: By August 27, 2014, the parties shall file a joint notice, indicating whether they have reached a resolution of all pending issues, whether the plaintiff's amended second motion for sanctions is rendered moot, and/or whether a hearing should be rescheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/13/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Counsel for the parties called the Court on July 11, 2014, at which time the following matters were addressed: The motion for extension of discovery deadline and motion to compel deposition 55 was GRANTED in part and MOOT in part. The mot ion for protective order 61 was GRANTED. The plaintiff WITHDREW its motion for sanctions 62 , and the Clerk is directed to terminate that motion. The motion for extension of discovery schedule 63 was GRANTED. The depositions noticed by th e defendants of the plaintiff and a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the plaintiff on July 15, 2014 (Docket Entry Nos. 59 and 60) will be rescheduled. The July 15, 2014, deadline for completion of all discovery was extended to September 2, 2014. The August 25, 2014, deadline for filing any dispositive motion is extended to October 15, 2014. The Clerk is directed to place Docket Entry No. 64 UNDER SEAL. The second motion for sanctions 67 is DENIED as MOOT. The motion for a hearing 69 is GRANTED. A hearing is scheduled on Tuesday, August 12, 2014, at 12:00 noon, in Courtroom 764 U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN, to address the plaintiff's amended second motion for sanctions 68 . The hearing may be held telephonically, at the plaintiff' s option, to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/1/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Upon the Court's request, counsel for the parties called the Court on 5/29/2014, at which time the following matters were addressed: Plaintiff's motion to compel 50 is Granted. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of discove ry deadline 51 and the plaintiff's amended motion for an extension of discovery deadline 52 are Granted. Plaintiff's motion to lessen the response time of production of documents for a discovery deposition 54 is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Joint MOTION to Amend Case Management Order. Discovery deadline reset for 6/2/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2014. Replies due by 10/6/2014. Jury Trial reset for 5/12/2015 in Cookeville before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference reset for 5/4/2015 at 1:30 PM in Cookeville before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/20/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/18/2014 at 4:00 PM, to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiff, to address the parties' joint motion and whether the parties want to reschedule the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/10/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DENIAL OF DEFAULT. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 5/7/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry Richardson Concrete LLC v. Mack Mechanichal, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Richardson Concrete LLC
Represented By: Tyce S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Mechanical, Inc
Represented By: William A. Lascara
Represented By: John L. Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Lascara
Represented By: John L. Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?