Cardin v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Mary Margaret Cardin
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2013cv00037
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Cookeville Office
County: White
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon review of this matter, the Court finds the Report to be well- founded and ADOPTS it in its entirety. Accordingly, the Court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Motion and AFFIRMS the decision of the Commissioner. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 6/13/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
May 19, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: In light of the foregoing, the Magistrate Judge recommends that plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record be DENIED and that the decision of the SSA be AFFIRMED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 5/19/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Margaret Cardin
Represented By: Donna Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?