Partipilo v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Savannah Lane Partipilo
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2013cv00060
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Cookeville Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Health Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 24 is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record 14 is herebyDENIED. This case is hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/26/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that the plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record (Docket Entry No. 14) be DENIED and that the Commissioner's decision be affirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 1/15/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have 30 days from entry of this order to file a motion for judgment on the record. Defendant shall, within 30 days of the filing of the plaintiff's motion, file a response. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the filing of the response to file a reply if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/22/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Partipilo v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Lane Partipilo
Represented By: John W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?