Gentry v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Karen Denise Gentry
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2018cv00083
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon. (am)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Social Security Administration (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attorney sent service packets by regular mail.) (am)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 24, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Donna Simpson. (dt)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2759108), filed by Karen Denise Gentry.(dt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Attachment - Oath Verifying Complaint, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet) (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Denise Gentry
Represented By: Donna Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?