Mooney v. Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC et al

Plaintiff: James O. Mooney
Defendant: Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC and M.D. Cynthia Cahill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00011
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Hurley Rader, III and Lane Moore. (jm)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC, Cynthia Cahill.(Rader, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by James O. Mooney. Cynthia Cahill served on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Haynes, Olen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by James O. Mooney. Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC served on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Haynes, Olen)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC and Cynthia Cahill. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
February 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Olen G. Haynes and Olen G. Haynes, Jr. (jm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC and Cynthia Cahill (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2862055), filed by James O. Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Cynthia Bledsoe, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Faith) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooney v. Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrdstown Medical Center, PLLC
Represented By: Daniel Hurley Rader, III
Represented By: Lane Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Cynthia Cahill
Represented By: Daniel Hurley Rader, III
Represented By: Lane Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O. Mooney
Represented By: Olen G. Haynes
Represented By: Olen G. Haynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?