Koger v. East Fork Stables, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjie Koger
Defendant: Allardt Land Company, Estate of Bruno Gernt, Inc. and East Fork Stables, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00051
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#21 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
August 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel H. Rader, IV and Andre S. Greppin. (jm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Allardt Land Company, East Fork Stables, Inc., Estate of Bruno Gernt, Inc..(Rader, Daniel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre S. Greppin on behalf of All Defendants (Greppin, Andre)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Rader, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Rader, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjie Koger. All Defendants served on 8/1/2019. (Burkhalter, David) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (jm).
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 (***DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE***) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjie Koger. All Defendants. (Burkhalter, David) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (jm).
July 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas S. Johnston, Jr. (jm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S. Johnston, Jr on behalf of Benjie Koger (Johnston, Douglas)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The #10 motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the Plaintiff filing a corrected complaint with the proper exhibits attached. Plaintiff shall include the descriptions of exhibits required by the Court's CM/ECF guidelines, as set out in the Court's July 5, 2019 notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/8/2019. (jm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Benjie Koger re #10 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Certain Exhibit re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's May 14, 2018 email, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's July 2, 2018 complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's resignation, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's EEOC Charge, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff's Right to Sue from the EEOC, #6 Attachment Attached Order Granting Motion)(Burkhalter, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Zachary J. Burkhalter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/8/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for D. Alexander Burkhalter, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/8/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for David A. Burkhalter, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/8/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. The exhibits shall be REFILED by filing a Notice of Filing and attaching the exhibits with the mandatory brief description. (EXAMPLE: Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Police Report dated 1/1/06, # 2 Exhibit 2 Unreported Case Smith v. Jones). (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Certain Exhibit re #1 Complaint,, by Benjie Koger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #6 Attachment Attached Order)(Burkhalter, David)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# ( #2 , #3 ,& #4 ): This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 01:00 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Allardt Land Company, East Fork Stables, Inc., and Estate of Bruno Gernt, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL D. Alexander Burkhalter, II, David Alexander Burkhalter, III, and Zachary Burkhalter: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 7/24/2019. (jm)
July 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for D. Alexander Burkhalter, II, David Alexander Burkhalter, III, and Zachary Burkhalter. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Zachary J. Burkhalter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2944331) by Benjie Koger. (Burkhalter, D.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney D. Alexander Burkhalter, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2944330) by Benjie Koger. (Burkhalter, D.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney David A. Burkhalter, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2944323) by Benjie Koger. (Burkhalter, D.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allardt Land Company, East Fork Stables, Inc., and Estate of Bruno Gernt, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2943462), filed by Benjie Koger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Supporting Documentation, #3 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Documentation, #4 Exhibit 3 - Supporting Documentation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Supporting Documentation, #6 Exhibit 5 - Supporting Documentation, #7 Exhibit 6 - Supporting Documentation, #8 Exhibit 7 - Supporting Documentation) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koger v. East Fork Stables, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allardt Land Company
Represented By: Daniel H. Rader, IV
Represented By: Andre S. Greppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Bruno Gernt, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel H. Rader, IV
Represented By: Andre S. Greppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Fork Stables, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel H. Rader, IV
Represented By: Andre S. Greppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjie Koger
Represented By: Zachary Burkhalter
Represented By: D. Alexander Burkhalter, II
Represented By: David Alexander Burkhalter, III
Represented By: Douglas S. Johnston, Jr.
Represented By: David Alexander Burkhalter, II
Represented By: D. Alexander Burkhalter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?