O'Dell v. Social Securtiy Administration
Plaintiff: Amy Grubb O'Dell
Defendant: Social Securtiy Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00054
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Social Securtiy Administration. (Coleman, Bert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Amy Grubb O'Dell. (Chermol, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Social Securtiy Administration . (Coleman, Bert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration by Social Securtiy Administration. (Coleman, Bert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 2, 2019 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (dt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Securtiy Administration (Coleman, Bert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Bert Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by Social Securtiy Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 8/2/2019 (dt).
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General/USA on 7/17/19. (dt)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed as to Social Securtiy Administration served on 7/15/2019. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIPT #34675055581 in the amount of $100.00 posted by Chermol Fishman LLC re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney/MDTN on 7/11/19. (dt)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/10/19. (Davies, Kirk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Securtiy Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to USM for service. (dt)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/9/19. (dt)
July 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert C. Wilson. (dt)
July 9, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for David F. Chermol. (dt)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Wilson on behalf of Amy Grubb O'Dell (Wilson, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for attorney David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid on 7/16/19) by Amy Grubb O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermol, David) Modified on 7/9/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt).
July 5, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 7/26/2019. (dt)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/26/2019. (dt)
July 5, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for David F. Chermol. (dt)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 4, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amy Grubb O'Dell. (dt)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Securtiy Administration, filed by Amy Grubb O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 7/5/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Dell v. Social Securtiy Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Securtiy Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Grubb O'Dell
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Represented By: Robert C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?