Smith v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Walter S. Smith
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00057
Filed: July 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is directed to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within twenty-eight (28) days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 9, 2019 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (mg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 SSA Administrative Record filed per #8 Answer to Complaint.. (Coleman, Bert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Coleman, Bert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 9/9/2019 (mg).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/24/2019. (mg)
July 24, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Forrest E. Jackson. (mg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney & mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (af)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General & mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (af)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration & mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (af)
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT filed by Walter S. Smith (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2955816). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter S. Smith
Represented By: Forrest E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?