Richardson v. White County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Richardson
Defendant: White County, Tennessee, Oddie Shoupe and Richard Lynch
Case Number: 2:2019cv00063
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Plaintiff and Defendants White County, TN and Richard Lynch have filed a Stipulation Dismissal (Doc. No. 7) in regard to defendant Odie Shoupe. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE against Odie Shoupe. Claims against the remaining defendants are still pending. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/29/2019. (am)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Oddie Shoupe by Ronnie D. Richardson. (Brooks, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronnie D. Richardson. Richard Lynch waiver sent on 8/27/2019. (Brooks, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronnie D. Richardson. White County, Tennessee waiver sent on 8/27/2019. (Brooks, Richard)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
August 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Marshall Brooks. (am)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Lynch, Oddie Shoupe, White County, Tennessee (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2968779), filed by Ronnie D. Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. White County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oddie Shoupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Richardson
Represented By: Richard Marshall Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?