Salsberry v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rockne Salsberry
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00066
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to General Counsel/Social Security Administration on 8/30/2019 by Rockne Salsberry. (mg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, DOJ on 9/3/2019 by Rockne Salsberry. (mg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney MDTN on 8/27/2019 by Rockne Salsberry. (mg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons along with 285 form issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to the U.S. Marshal to effect service. (mg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( #2 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions and to conduct further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/20/19. (gb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Donna Simpson. (dt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rockne Salsberry. (dt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Rockne Salsberry. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salsberry v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockne Salsberry
Represented By: Donna Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?