Burnett v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sam Burnett
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00082
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within twenty-eight (28) days of entry of this Order. The plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of the defendant's responsive brief to file a reply brief, if necessary. The reply brief shall not exceed five (5) pages absent permission from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 SSA Administrative Record filed per #15 Answer to Social Security Complaint.. (Coleman, Bert)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Social Security Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Coleman, Bert)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 11/13/2019. (am)
November 20, 2019 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (am)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Social Security Administration, served on 11/8/2019. (jm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney on 11/4/2019. (am)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/31/2019. (am)
October 30, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson. (am)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Sam Burnett (Wilson, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/29/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3020153) by Sam Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CGS WD, #2 Attachment CGS Supreme Court, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/29/2019) (am).
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/15/2019. (am)
October 25, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout. (am)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sam Burnett. (am)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $0, Receipt number 0), filed by Sam Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Burnett
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Robert Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?