Seagraves v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Dallas Seagraves
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00083
Filed: October 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within twenty-eight (28) days of entry of this Order. The plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of the defendant's responsive brief to file a reply brief, if necessary. The reply brief shall not exceed five (5) pages absent permission from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 SSA Administrative Record filed per #12 Answer to Social Security Complaint.. (Hayes, Jeremiah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Social Security Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Hayes, Jeremiah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah D. Hayes on behalf of Social Security Administration (Hayes, Jeremiah)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 6, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (am)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed Social Security Administration served on 11/4/2019. (am)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney General, served on 11/7/2019. (jm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 11/1/2019. (am)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Social Security Administration.(Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/30/2019. (am)
October 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Donna Simpson. (am)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Dallas Seagraves. (am)
October 26, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0), filed by Michael Dallas Seagraves. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seagraves v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dallas Seagraves
Represented By: Donna Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?