Linson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joshua C. Linson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00092
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/20/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 12/4/2019. (am)
December 19, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 12/2/2019. (am)
December 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis. (am)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Kaludis on behalf of Joshua C. Linson (Kaludis, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 11/25/2019. (am)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/21/2019. (am)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3035073) by Joshua C. Linson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 20, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer. (am)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/11/2019. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joshua C. Linson. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Joshua C. Linson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Letter to Clerk, #3 Exhibit - Notice of Appeals to Council)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua C. Linson
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?