Coker v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cody Travis Coker
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General on 1/21/2020. (gb)
February 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson. (gb)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is directed to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within 28 days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 SSA Administrative Record filed per #18 Answer to Social Security Complaint.. (Coleman, Bert)
February 6, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Social Security Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Coleman, Bert)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/30/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 29, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (gb)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed Social Security Administration served on 1/21/2020. (gb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified text on 1/29/2020 (gb).
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office of General Counsel on 01/10/2020 by Cody Travis Coker. (Osterhout, Karl)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General on 01/15/2020 by Cody Travis Coker. (Osterhout, Karl)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 01/17/2020 by Cody Travis Coker. (Osterhout, Karl)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney on 1/17/2020. (gb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Cody Travis Coker (Wilson, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to the USM for service. (gb) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/13/2020) (gb). Modified text on 1/13/2020 (gb).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/10/2020. (gb)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/3/2020. (hb)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3054353) by Cody Travis Coker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CGS PA Supreme Court, #2 Attachment CGS WD PA, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cody Travis Coker. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Cody Travis Coker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/9/2020. (gb)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 1/9/2020. (gb)
December 19, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout. (gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Travis Coker
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Robert Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?