Grisham v. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC
Plaintiff: Kyle S. Grisham
Defendant: Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00004
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark E. Stamelos, Paul Maxwell Smith, III and Cynthia A. Wilson. (dt)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC.(Smith, Paul)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC answer due 3/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/21/2020. (vh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Smith, Paul)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Smith, Paul)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Maxwell Smith, III on behalf of Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Smith, Paul)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Stamelos, Mark)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Kyle S. Grisham. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC served on 1/29/2020. (Wilson, Cynthia)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 3:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3071369), filed by Kyle S. Grisham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grisham v. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle S. Grisham
Represented By: Cynthia A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?