Wildfong et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harry Clayton Wildfong and Darlene Wildfong
Defendant: Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00006
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. #57 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/10/2020. (mg)
February 28, 2020 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James C. Barton, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/11/2020. (mg) Modified on 2/13/2020 (mg).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David B. Thomas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/11/2020. (mg) Modified on 2/12/2020 (mg).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Susan M. Robinson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/11/2020. (mg) (Main Document 54 replaced on 2/13/2020) (mg).
February 11, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of David B. Thomas by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent for Withdrawal of Counsel of Record)(Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 11, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Susan M. Robinson by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent for Withdrawal of Counsel of Record)(Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 11, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of James C. Burton, Jr. (Modak-Truran, Anita) Modified on 2/13/2020 (mg). Modified on 2/13/2020 (mg).
February 5, 2020 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Tennessee by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 5, 2020 MS State Bar status verified as active for Kari L. Sutherland. Sutherland has been admitted to practice in this district. (mg)
February 4, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of William Gage (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 4, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of Christy Jones (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 4, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Sutherland, Kari)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Christopher A. Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/29/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Lee B. Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/29/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 28, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Randall L. Kinnard, and Mary Ellen Morris. (mg)
January 28, 2020 PA State Bar status verified as active for Christopher A. Gomez, and Lee B. Balefsky. (mg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Morris on behalf of Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong (Morris, Mary)
January 27, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall L. Kinnard on behalf of Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong (Kinnard, Randall)
January 27, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for attorney Christopher A. Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3073789) by Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Gomez, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for attorney Lee B. Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3073783) by Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Balefsky, Lee)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David B. Thomas, Christy D. Jones, William M. Gage, James C. Barton, Jr, Susan M. Robinson, Lee B. Balefsky, Michelle L. Tiger: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/14/2020. (mg)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lee B. Balefsky, and Michelle L. Tiger: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 2/14/2020. (mg)
January 24, 2020 AL State Bar status verified as active for James C. Barton, Jr. (mg)
January 24, 2020 WV State Bar status verified as active for David B. Thomas, and Susan M. Robinson. (mg)
January 24, 2020 MS State Bar status verified as active for Christy D. Jones, and William M. Gage. (mg)
January 24, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anita K. Modak-Truran. (mg)
January 24, 2020 PA State Bar status verified as active for Lee B. Balefsky, and Michelle L. Tiger. (mg)
January 23, 2020 Filing 36 Case transferred in from the District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-01388. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 12, 2020 Filing 35 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2134) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2232) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2910) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6860) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6965) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7143) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filers) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 12, 2020 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2027) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #2 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2180) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #3 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2915) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #4 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3036) Reply Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #5 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6790) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Joseph Carbone, #6 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7007) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Joseph Carbone, #7 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7128) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Joseph Carbone, #8 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2076) Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #9 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2098) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #10 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2140) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #11 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2253) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #12 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6820) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Teri Longacre, #13 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6969) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Teri Longacre, #14 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7099) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Teri Longacre, #15 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2117) Motion to Exclude Christopher Ramsey, #16 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2118) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Christopher Ramsey, #17 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2908) Memo in Response of Motion to Exclude Christopher Ramsey, #18 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3050) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Christopher Ramsey, #19 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6837) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Christopher Ramsey, #20 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7005) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Christopher Ramsey, #21 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7442) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Christopher Ramsey, #22 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2039) Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #23 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2042) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #24 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2187) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #25 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2247) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #26 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2458) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #27 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2621) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #28 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2841) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #29 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2957) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #30 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3037) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #31 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6857) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Shelby Thames, #32 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6972) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Shelby Thames, #33 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7113) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filers)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 12, 2020 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3865) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6875) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7038) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7045) Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7183) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3630) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3855) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6648) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6926) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7123) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2759) Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, #14 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2760) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, #15 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2949) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, #16 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3017) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, #17 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6821) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Peggy Pence, #18 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6958) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Peggy Pence, #19 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (7177) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Peggy Pence, #20 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2817) Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2818) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (2931) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (3024) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (5332) Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (5333) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (5482) Response Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (5548) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6852) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Bruce Rosenzweig, #29 Exhibit ECF #32 Continued - (6960) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filers)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 12, 2020 Filing 32 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit (2047) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit (2047) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit (2047) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit (2047) Part 4 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit (2047) Part 5 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit (2047) Part 6 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit (2047) Part 7 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit (2047) Part 8 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit (2047) Part 9 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit (2047) Part 10 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit (2047) Part 11 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit (2047) Part 12 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit (2047) Part 13 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit (2047) Part 14 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit (2455) Part 1 - Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #21 Exhibit (2455) Part 2 - Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #22 Exhibit (2553) Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #23 Exhibit (2553) Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #24 Exhibit (2553) Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #25 Exhibit (2839) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #26 Exhibit (2839) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #27 Exhibit (3619) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #28 Exhibit (3619) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #29 Exhibit (3626) Part 1 Motion to Limit Uwe Klinge, #30 Exhibit (3626) Part 2 Motion to Limit Uwe Klinge, #31 Exhibit (3767) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #32 Exhibit (3767) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #33 Exhibit (3767) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #34 Exhibit (3767) Part 4 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #35 Exhibit (3790) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #36 Exhibit (3790) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #37 Exhibit (3790) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #38 Exhibit (6874) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #39 Exhibit (6874) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #40 Exhibit (6874) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong in opposition to #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong in opposition to #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to add party filers)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Subpoena to Dr. Lee Congleton by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Barton, James) (Modified on 7/3/2018 to remove link to #18 notice) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 18 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Lee Congleton on 07/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. EDT (Barton, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Subpoena to Dr. Lee Congleton by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Barton, James) (Modified on 6/29/2018 to remove link to #16 notice) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Lee Congleton on 07/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. EDT.(Barton, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Subpoena to Dr. Lee Congleton by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Barton, James) (Modified on 6/28/2018 to remove link to #14 notice) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Lee Congleton on 07/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Barton, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James C. Barton, Jr on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Barton, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Darlene Wildfong on 6/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Lee Congleton on 4/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Darlene Wildfong, Harry Clayton Wildfong. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 27, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 31, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 22, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 95 (AGREED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ADDITIONAL COOK ENTITIES IN ALL CASES) entered on 01/17/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2896782. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement) (cwm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildfong et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Clayton Wildfong
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Wildfong
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Anita K. Modak-Truran
Represented By: James C. Barton, Jr.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Anita K. Modak-Truran
Represented By: James C. Barton, Jr.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?