Selby v. Schroeder
Plaintiff: Becky A. Selby
Defendant: Holly T Schroeder and Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders' and Exhibitors' Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00016
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
March 9, 2020 PA State Bar status verified as active for Michael D. Reed, Stephen S Werner, and David A. Fitzsimons. (mg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 54 ***DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) Modified on 3/9/2020 (mg). Modified on 3/9/2020 (mg).
March 9, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Veronica L Morrison, Michael D. Reed, Stephen S Werner, David A. Fitzsimons, and Colleen A. Baird: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 3/30/2020. (mg)
March 9, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Veronica L Morrison, Michael D. Reed, Stephen S Werner, David A. Fitzsimons, and Colleen A. Baird: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/30/2020. (mg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
March 6, 2020 Filing 51 Case transferred in from the District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00061. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 3/9/2020 (mg).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED The above-captioned action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/6/2020. (ktt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
March 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 48 deleted and refiled as Doc. 49. (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 49 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3), #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Becky A. Selby.(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
March 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 48 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Sur Reply Brief. (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) and Order of Court 2-18-2020 filed by Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders and Exhibitors Association.(Baird, Colleen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 46 Supplement by Holly T Schroeder. Supplement to Brief Opposing Transfer. (Reed, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 45 Supplement by Holly T Schroeder. Brief Opposing Transfer. (Reed, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' motions (Docs. #30 , #39 ) to dismiss are GRANTED to the extent that this court finds that it lacks personal jurisdiction over defendants as to all claims in the amended complaint. 2. The parties shall provide supplemental briefing regarding transfer by no later than close of business on Tuesday, March 3, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/18/2020. (ktt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders and Exhibitors Association, #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Holly T Schroeder. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/18/2020. (ktt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 42 Letter from David A. Fitzsimons, Esq. to Chief Judge Conner. (Fitzsimons, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A through D)(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 40 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders and Exhibitors Association.(Baird, Colleen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) by Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders and Exhibitors Association.(Baird, Colleen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Fitzsimons on behalf of Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders and Exhibitors Association (Fitzsimons, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Becky A. Selby. Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders and Exhibitors Association waiver sent on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Holly T Schroeder.(Reed, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Becky A. Selby re #26 Amended Complaint Served Upon Defendant TWHBEA (Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Sets forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretrial & trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2020; Motions in Limine due by 10/7/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 @ 01:30 PM in Harrisburg Jury Room #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 12/7/2020 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2; Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2020; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 11/11/2020. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/18/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Becky A. Selby. (Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Holly T Schroeder.(Reed, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Reed on behalf of Holly T Schroeder (Reed, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER RESCHEDULING 11/26/19 Case Management Conference TO 12/18/2019 @ 10:30 AM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/25/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING deft Schroeder's MTD #25 complaint as MOOT & without prejudice & directing defts to respond to amended complaint #26 in acc w/ the FRCP. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/19/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Becky A. Selby.(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Holly T Schroeder.(Morrison, Veronica) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 11/26/2019 @ 10:30 AM - Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the telephone conference to Chambers. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/28/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting deft's motion #20 to set aside entry of default, dismissing deft's pro se motion #15 to open default jdgmt as moot & directing deft to file a counseled response to complaint by 11/6/19. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/23/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #20 MOTION to Set Aside Default [Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default] filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Werner, Stephen) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/3/2019) (rw). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT [Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default] re #20 MOTION to Set Aside Default [Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default], #15 MOTION to Open Default Judgement re #13 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Holly T Schroeder.(Morrison, Veronica) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Set Aside Default [Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default] by Holly T Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyer, Veronica) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica L Boyer on behalf of Holly T Schroeder (Boyer, Veronica) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #15 MOTION to Open Default Judgement re #13 Clerk's Entry of Default 2nd Brief filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A - E, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F)(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 16 deleted and refiled as doc. 17. (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #15 MOTION to Open Default Judgement re #13 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 16 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Open Default Judgement re #13 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Holly T Schroeder.(pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Holly T Schroeder.(pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 SET ASIDE (per 10/23/19 order #23 of court) - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Holly T Schroeder.(aaa) Modified on 10/23/2019 (ki). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by Becky A. Selby. Last publication date 6/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Publication)(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting pltf's motions #7 #9 to permit service by publication - pltf shall publish substantially the info in summons in 2 qualified publications, one of general circulation & one legal journal, both of which cover geographical region & county where deft resides & shall return proof of such publication. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/11/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Service by Publication by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: order to show cause #5 permitting pltf addt'l 60 days to effect service upon deft. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/16/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
April 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a Proposed Order for Doc. 7. (dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication by Becky A. Selby.(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Becky A. Selby . (Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing pltf to w/in 15 days of date of this order show cause why action should not be dismissed for failure to serve summons & complaint w/in 90 days pursuant to FRCP 4(m). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/11/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT(S) Disclosure Statement F.R.C.P. 7.1 by Becky A. Selby re #1 Complaint, filed by Becky A. Selby. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Becky A. Selby.(Werner, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/10/19. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Holly T Schroeder and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holly T Schroeder ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4644063), filed by Becky A. Selby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 3/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selby v. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly T Schroeder
Represented By: Veronica L Morrison
Represented By: Michael D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Walking Horse Breeders' and Exhibitors' Association
Represented By: David A. Fitzsimons
Represented By: Colleen A. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky A. Selby
Represented By: Stephen S Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?