Dalton v. State of Tennessee et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv00022
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Cookeville Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 OFFER OF PROOF/EVIDENCE IN CHIEF SUPPORT OF CASE NO.2:20-cv-0022 by Jeremy James Dalton (am)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Because the petitioner's IFP application and affidavit substantially comply with the requirements of Rule 3(a)(2) of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts (Habeas Rules) and demonstrate that he lacks sufficient funds to pay the filing fee, his application (Doc. No. 9) is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the petitioner's pending motions (Doc. Nos. 4, 5, 6, 7, 12, and 13) are DENIED as moot. Because a plain procedural bar is present in this case and jurists of reason could not find that it was incorrectly invoked or that the petitioner should be allowed to proceed further, no certificate of appealability shall issue. For the same reasons, the court CERTIFIES that any appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/2/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy James Dalton. (Address updated per Notice). (am)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Portions of Record by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Ascertain Status by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 ADDENDUM TO STATUS MOTION by Jeremy James Dalton (am)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 ADDENDUM AND AFFIDAVIT re #9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send the petitioner a blank IFP application form. The petitioner's submission of either the filing fee or a proper IFP application must be RECEIVED in this court within 28 days of the date this order is entered on the docket and must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 2:20-cv-00022. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/11/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank IFP (short) form by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Request to Appoint Attorney by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Request for Polygraph Examination(s) by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Subpeonas by Jeremy James Dalton. (am)
April 17, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 (UNSIGNED) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy James Dalton. (am) Modified Date on 4/17/2020 (am).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeremy James Dalton.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. State of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?