Worthington v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Melissa A. Worthington
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2020cv00023
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 5/11/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
May 8, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (am)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/28/2020. (am)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
April 24, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Donna Simpson. (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3129464), filed by Melissa A. Worthington. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worthington v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa A. Worthington
Represented By: Donna Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?