Coe v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shiela Gail Coe
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2020cv00029
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/29/2020. (am)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 5/29/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
May 27, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis. (am)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Kaludis on behalf of Shiela Gail Coe (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Kaludis, William)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3146336) by Shiela Gail Coe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shiela Gail Coe. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Shiela Gail Coe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Attachment - Letter to Clerk)(am)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 6/11/2020. (am)
May 21, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer. (am)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/11/2020. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coe v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiela Gail Coe
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?