Emery v. Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Emery
Defendant: Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC, Jessica Yepifantsev and Konstantin Yepifantsev
Case Number: 2:2020cv00038
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Bonnie Emery. Konstantin Yepifantsev served on 7/22/2020. (Burgener, Joshua)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Bonnie Emery. Jessica Yepifantsev served on 7/22/2020. (Burgener, Joshua)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Bonnie Emery. Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC served on 7/22/2020. (Burgener, Joshua)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/23/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bonnie Emery. (Burgener, Joshua)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Bonnie Emery Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)(Klett, Peter)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC, Jessica Yepifantsev, Konstantin Yepifantsev. (Service packet sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
July 15, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Peter F. Klett, III, Joshua L. Burgener, Trevor Wayne Howell. (am)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC, Jessica Yepifantsev, Konstantin Yepifantsev (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3176671), filed by Bonnie Emery. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Agreement, #3 Exhibit - Consent Form)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emery v. Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Emery
Represented By: Joshua L. Burgener
Represented By: Trevor Wayne Howell
Represented By: Peter F. Klett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Caregivers of Cookeville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Yepifantsev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Yepifantsev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?