Taylor v. Effler et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv00044
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Cookeville Office
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00155. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/23/2020 (dt).
July 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/23/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT ORDER; the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this entire action to the United States District Court for the Northeastern Division of the Middle District of Tennessee and CLOSE this Court's file. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/22/20. (c/m)(ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/23/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of the following Judgment Order, transferring case. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/22/20. (c/m Christopher D Taylor FENTRESS COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT 140 JUSTICE CENTER DR JAMESTOWN, TN 38556)(ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/23/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Christopher D. Taylor)(JCK) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/23/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Todd Burnette, Jared Effler, Marney E Gilliam, Phillip Kazee, Jerry Mifflin (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Christopher D Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/23/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher D Taylor. (JCK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #1 Other Letter regarding Inmate Trust Account) (JCK). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/23/2020.] Modified on 7/23/2020 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Effler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?